Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

Archidioecesis Camberiensis (-Maruianensis-Tarantasiensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 26 April 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lyon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,460 (2,881 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-savoie.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Maison diocesaine, 2 place Cardinal Garrone, B.P. 107, 73001 Chambery CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 4.79.33.26.09
  • Fax: 4.79.33.26.95

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chambéry
18 August 1779ErectedDiocese of Grenoble Diocese of Chambéry (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne (suppressed) Diocese of Chambéry
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise) (suppressed) Diocese of Chambéry
Archdiocese of Chambéry
10 July 1817ElevatedDiocese of Chambéry Archdiocese of Chambéry
15 February 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Chambéry Diocese of Annecy (erected)
5 August 1825Territory LostArchdiocese of Chambéry Diocese of Tarentaise (erected)
7 August 1825Territory LostArchdiocese of Chambéry Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne (erected)
Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)
26 April 1966UnitedArchdiocese of Chambéry
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
Diocese of Tarentaise
Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise) (no longer a Metroplitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Chambéry
1950129,700130,50099.4%29285377344197633174ap1951
1957138,000140,00098.6%28212040234376500175ap1960
Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)
1970256,973286,39989.7%41174485529102715357ap1971
1980276,000307,00089.9%3426340568180730370ap1981
1990316,000339,00093.2%246553011,0495107579348ap1991
1999331,600354,70093.5%199102091,5861520348354ap2000
2000347,000371,34393.4%177452221,5631671380367ap2001
2001341,000365,62593.3%186242101,6231661373348ap2002
2002332,600356,74893.2%170322021,6461770356348ap2003
2003314,000356,74888.0%169562251,39518106447346ap2004
2004314,000356,74888.0%165321971,5931960386200ap2005
2006316,982360,25288.0%112301422,2321941312111ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013