Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Reynaud, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo], China

Titular Bishop of Fussala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1854Born
19 May 187319.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
7 Jun 187925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 Mar 188429.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}, China
7 Mar 188429.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
29 Jun 188430.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
10 May 191056.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Orientale}, China
23 Feb 192671.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo], China

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Reynaud (VIAF: 284319256)
Bishop Paul-Marie Reynaud C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Croix-en-Jarez, France

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017