Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grenoble-Vienne

Dioecesis Gratianopolitanus--Viennensis Allobrogum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 15 December 2006
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lyon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,467 (2,884 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-grenoble-vienne.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 12 Place La Valette, 38028 Grenoble CEDEX 1, France
  • Telephone: 4.38.38.00.38
  • Fax: 4.38.38.00.39

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Grenoble
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Grenoble (erected)
18 August 1779Territory LostDiocese of Grenoble Diocese of Chambéry (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Die (suppressed) Diocese of Grenoble
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Gap (suppressed) Diocese of Digne
Diocese of Grenoble
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Vienne (suppressed) Diocese of Grenoble
Diocese of Valence
Diocese of Grenoble-Vienne
15 December 2006Name ChangedDiocese of Grenoble Diocese of Grenoble-Vienne

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Grenoble
1949400,000700,00057.1%57580655610100400599ap1951
1970780,000849,68391.8%5381576951,1222141,408600ap1971
1980706,000876,00080.6%405844891,4435100800575ap1981
1990760,000963,00078.9%322804021,890892887588ap1991
1999804,0001,020,00078.8%267833502,29726121832588ap2000
2000800,0001,015,75378.8%271873582,23425119820189ap2001
2001800,0001,015,75378.8%225773022,64924109820189ap2002
2002700,0001,080,70064.8%210792892,42224109220189ap2003
2003800,0001,145,59869.8%218772952,7112493800189ap2004
2004700,0001,145,59861.1%207772842,46429108220146ap2005
Diocese of Grenoble-Vienne
2006707,0001,156,00061.2%202522542,783338322048ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014