Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Taberd, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Isauropolis

Vicar Apostolic of Bengal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1794Born
27 Jul 181723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon, France
Aug 182026.1ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Sep 182733.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
18 Sep 182733.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
30 May 183035.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
1838¹43.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bengal, India
31 Jul 184046.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Taberd (VIAF: 71696000)
Bishop Jean-Louis Taberd M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne, France

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast