Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen (Jean Étienne) Bazin

Deceased

Bishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1796Born
22 Jul 182225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alabama and the Floridas, USA
23 Apr 184750.5AppointedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
24 Oct 184751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
23 Apr 184851.5DiedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stephen (Jean Étienne) Bazin
Bishop John Stephen (Jean Étienne) Bazin (born , died ) Bishop of Vincennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuerne, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vincennes, Diocese of Vincennes, Indiana

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast