Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre d’Éspinac

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1540Born
16 Sep 157333.3AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
18 Dec 157535.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
9 Jan 159958.6DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Éspinac (VIAF: 27074248)
Archbishop Pierre d’Éspinac (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApinac, Loire
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast