Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine d’Albon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507¹Born
14 Jul 156457.5AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
15 Oct 156457.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
1573¹66.0ResignedArchbishop of Lyon, France
24 Sep 157467.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine d’Albon (VIAF: 304010662)
Archbishop Antoine d’Albon (born 1507, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel, Saint-Just-en-Chevalet

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Oct 2017