Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Marie-Hippolyte Carrie, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1842Born
15 Jun 186725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
25 Aug 186725.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Jan 187532.9AppointedPrefect of Congo
8 Jun 188644.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of French Congo {Congo Francese}, Congo
8 Jun 188644.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
24 Oct 188644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
14 Oct 189048.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
Nov 1903³61.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
13 Oct 190462.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Marie-Hippolyte Carrie
Bishop Antoine-Marie-Hippolyte Carrie C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProprières, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained Bishop30, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017