Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Eustace Dupeyron, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1804Born
15 Aug 184944.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
11 Sep 185146.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
27 Sep 185550.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
28 Jul 187267.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for James Eustace Dupeyron
Father James Eustace Dupeyron S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast