Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Poncet, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1884BornSaint-Chamond, France
4 Jul 190924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
11 Nov 193550.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
11 Nov 193550.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
1 Mar 193651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
22 Dec 196177.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Sep 197388.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Poncet:
Bishop Alexandre Poncet S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013