Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude de Saint-Georges

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornMontceaux-l’Etoile
8 Sep 169360.6SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
26 Oct 169360.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
22 Nov 169360.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
8 Jun 171481.4DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Saint-Georges:
Archbishop Claude de Saint-Georges (born 1633, died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015