Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ippolito Cardinal d’Este (II)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novara

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1509BornFerrara
20 May 15199.7AppointedAdministrator of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 Dec 153829.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Mar 153929.5Elevated to Cardinal
29 Oct 153930.2AppointedAdministrator of Lyon, France
10 Nov 153930.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
26 Apr 154232.7AppointedAdministrator of Tréguier, France
23 Jan 154737.4AppointedAdministrator of Autun, France
26 Nov 154839.3ResignedAdministrator of Tréguier, France
19 Mar 155040.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
17 Jun 155040.8ResignedAdministrator of Autun, France
27 Jun 155040.8AppointedAdministrator of Narbonne, France
22 Apr 155141.7AppointedAdministrator of Auch, France
11 May 155141.7ResignedAdministrator of Lyon, France
18 Nov 155142.2ResignedBishop of Novara, Italy
1555²45.4AppointedAdministrator of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Dec 155647.3ResignedAdministrator of Milano {Milan}, Italy
156252.4AppointedAdministrator of Arles, France
24 Apr 156252.7AppointedAdministrator of Lyon, France
8 Oct 156354.1ResignedAdministrator of Auch, France
14 Jul 156454.9ResignedAdministrator of Lyon, France
8 Oct 156455.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
8 Dec 156455.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
13 Apr 156555.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
156757.4ResignedAdministrator of Arles, France
2 Dec 157263.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito d’Este (II):
Cardinal Ippolito d’Este (II) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novara

  • a cardinal for 34.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 260, and Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013