Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Bouchut, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Panemotichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1860Born
17 Feb 188322.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Jul 190242.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
23 Jul 190242.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Panemotichus
21 Sep 190242.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panemotichus
17 Dec 192868.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Bouchut
Bishop Jean-Claude Bouchut M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Christo-en-Jarez, France

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast