Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célestin-Félix-Joseph Chouvellon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China

Titular Bishop of Dausara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1849Born
1871¹21.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Sep 187323.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
25 Sep 189141.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China
25 Sep 189141.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dausara
27 Dec 189142.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dausara
11 May 192474.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Célestin-Félix-Joseph Chouvellon
Bishop Célestin-Félix-Joseph Chouvellon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUsson-en-Forez, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast