Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Rohan

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹Born
9 Dec 150020.9AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
16 Jun 150424.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
13 Oct 153656.7DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Rohan (VIAF: 189709156)
Archbishop François de Rohan (born 1480, died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Quentin, Archdiocese of Mainz, Germany
Ordained BishopSeiches, Maine et Loire, Ste Croix du Verger

  • a bishop for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,595
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast