Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent V

Bl. Pierre de Tarentaise, O.P. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1224¹BornChampagny, France
6 Jun 127248.4AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
3 Jun 127349.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
3 Jun 127349.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jan 127652.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Feb 127652.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Jun 127652.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Mar 1898Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Pierre de Tarentaise:
Holy Father Bl. Pierre de Tarentaise O.P. (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 2.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jun 1273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013