Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yves-Alexandre de Marbeuf

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1734BornRennes
175419.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 176732.9SelectedBishop of Autun, France
15 Jun 176733.1ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
12 Jul 176733.2Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
12 May 178854.0SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
12 Sep 178854.3ResignedBishop of Autun, France
15 Sep 178854.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
15 Apr 179964.9DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Yves-Alexandre de Marbeuf:
Archbishop Yves-Alexandre de Marbeuf (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 67, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013