Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude Marie Joseph Dupuy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1901BornChevrières
20 Mar 192624.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 195553.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
7 Mar 195553.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
27 Apr 195553.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
4 Dec 196160.2AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
15 Jun 197472.8RetiredArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
13 Feb 198987.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Claude Marie Joseph Dupuy:
Archbishop Claude Marie Joseph Dupuy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013