Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Simon, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1858Born
Jul 1885³26.5AppointedPrefect of Orange River, South Africa
4 May 189839.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa
4 May 189839.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
21 Sep 189839.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
21 Nov 193273.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Simon (VIAF: 310694708)
Bishop Jean-Marie Simon O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Orange River

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Troyes, Diocese of Troyes, France

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017