Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Fesch

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1763Born
178723.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 180239.5SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
4 Aug 180239.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
15 Aug 180239.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
17 Jan 180340.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jan 180340.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
2 Dec 182259.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
13 May 183976.3DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Fesch (VIAF: 21484)
Joseph Cardinal Fesch (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAjaccio, Diocese of Ajaccio

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
  • a cardinal for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast