Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Yves Michel

Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1960 Born
1 Jul 199030.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lyon (-Vienne), France
30 Jun 199131.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
4 Apr 201454.1AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
29 May 201454.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Yves Michel
Bishop Pierre-Yves Michel (born ) Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoanne
Ordained DeaconSaint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained PriestSaint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained BishopParc des Expositions de Valence, Valence, Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,171
  • od/c01: AJ, 29 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast