Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Crétin

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1799BornMontluel, France
4 May 182323.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 182324.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 185050.6AppointedBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
26 Jan 185151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
22 Feb 185757.2DiedBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Crétin:
Bishop Joseph Crétin (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Paul

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013