Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de Villars

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1331AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
24 Jan 1337AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
7 Oct 1342AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
25 Sep 1354DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Villars:
Archbishop Henri de Villars (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 316, and Page 513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014