Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexandre-Charles-Albert-Joseph Cardinal Renard

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1906Born
12 Jul 193125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
19 Aug 195347.1AppointedBishop of Versailles, France
19 Oct 195347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Versailles, France
27 Oct 195347.3InstalledBishop of Versailles, France
28 May 196760.9AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
26 Jun 196761.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196761.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti
24 May 197669.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
29 Oct 198175.3RetiredArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
8 Oct 198377.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Charles-Albert-Joseph Renard (VIAF: 85178357)
Alexandre-Charles-Albert-Joseph Cardinal Renard (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvelin

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • i: AJ, 17 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Mar 2017