Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Paul-François-Marie-Félix Lyonnet

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1801BornSaint-Étienne
18 Jul 182423.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 185150.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
15 Mar 185250.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
25 Apr 185250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
7 Jul 185756.1SelectedBishop of Valence, France
6 Aug 185756.1ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
11 Dec 186463.5SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
27 Mar 186563.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
18 May 186563.9InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
24 Dec 187574.5DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul-François-Marie-Félix Lyonnet:
Archbishop Jean-Paul-François-Marie-Félix Lyonnet (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013