Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Sicault

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1711AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
19 Oct 1711AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
30 Nov 1711Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
8 Sep 1733DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Sicault:
Bishop Antoine Sicault (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015