Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Grillet, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1666³BornMontmelian
5 Mar 168922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 169024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Jul 172962.7SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
3 Oct 172962.9ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
9 Oct 172962.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
14 Sep 173063.8DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Grillet:
Bishop Jean Grillet O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015