Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1674BornGrumo
20 Dec 169824.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 172854.3AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
31 Dec 172854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
27 Dec 174470.3DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Silvestri:
Bishop Francesco Silvestri (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013