Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Vincenzo Maria Cardinal Ferreri, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1682Born
15 Mar 170522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Jul 172745.3AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
4 Aug 172745.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
6 Jul 172947.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jul 172947.2SelectedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
23 Dec 172947.6ConfirmedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
23 Dec 172947.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
9 Dec 174260.6DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Vincenzo Maria Ferreri
Carlo Vincenzo Maria Cardinal Ferreri O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice, France

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jul 1729
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77, and Page 411
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast