Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Mondilio Orsini, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1690³BornSolofra
24 Jun 171322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
26 Jun 172433.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
23 Jul 172434.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
20 Nov 172434.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
8 Mar 172837.6AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
23 Mar 172938.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
19 Dec 174353.4ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Jan 1750³59.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mondilio Orsini:
Patriarch Mondilio Orsini C.O. (born , died Jan 1750) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 173, and Page 265
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015