Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Lanfredini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1670BornFlorence
16 Mar 172756.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 173463.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 173463.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
15 Sep 173463.9AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
4 Apr 173564.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
15 Sep 174069.9ResignedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
16 May 174170.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Lanfredini:
Cardinal Giacomo Lanfredini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 14.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
  • a cardinal for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1734

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013