Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercole Michele d’Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1682BornAlessano
1 May 172340.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 May 172340.4AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
23 May 172340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
26 Sep 172542.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
27 Sep 173451.8AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
Jul 173552.6DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercole Michele d’Aragona:
Archbishop Ercole Michele d’Aragona (born ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1735
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013