Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1669Born
14 Feb 169324.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 172960.8AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
30 Nov 172960.8Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
May 1743³74.2DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Silvestri
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Silvestri (born , died May 1743) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampobasso

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast