Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Fargna

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1665³Born
2 Oct 172863.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 172964.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
20 Feb 172964.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
2 Oct 173065.6DiedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Fargna
Bishop Bartolomeo Fargna (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Emmaüs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà della Pieve, Italy

  • a priest for 2.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast