Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Maielli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1669BornNapoli
21 Mar 169324.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172455.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
21 Sep 172455.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
3 Jan 173969.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maielli:
Archbishop Carlo Maielli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Hemesa

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015