Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Tasca

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1676BornChieti
4 Dec 170125.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172650.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
26 Dec 172650.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
22 Dec 173660.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tasca:
Archbishop Antonio Tasca (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1726, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015