Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Nin

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1672BornCalaritan
27 Mar 170028.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172655.0AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
Dec 174068.9DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Nin:
Archbishop Antonio Nin , Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 40.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014