Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Manfredi

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1674BornCryptolarum
6 Apr 169722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 169723.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 172450.2AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
26 Nov 172450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
3 Mar 173863.5AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
10 Mar 174671.6DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Manfredi:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Manfredi (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298, and Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1724, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015