Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Alberto Cardinal Guidobono Cavalchini

Deceased

Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1683BornTortona, Italy
24 Feb 172743.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 172844.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
6 Jun 172844.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
9 Sep 174360.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174360.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
2 Mar 174864.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
24 Jun 175268.9AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
29 Jan 175369.5ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
15 Jul 175874.9AppointedDatary of the Apostolic Datary
12 Feb 175975.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
16 May 176379.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
7 Mar 177490.6DiedDatary of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Carlo Alberto Guidobono Cavalchini
Carlo Alberto Cardinal Guidobono Cavalchini (born , died ) Datary of Apostolic Datary

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
  • a cardinal for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016