Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Pecchioli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1677Born
24 Oct 170022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Sep 172850.7AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
26 Sep 172850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
22 Jan 174870.1DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Pecchioli
Bishop Raimondo Pecchioli O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast