Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Carolis

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1670Born
17 Dec 171949.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 172958.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
18 Sep 172959.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
27 Nov 174474.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Carolis
Archbishop Pietro de Carolis (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope

EventPlace
Birth PlacePopharium

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast