Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico de Zaoli (Zaulis)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

Titular Archbishop of Teodosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornValencia
6 Mar 169052.1AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
12 Mar 169052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
26 Apr 170870.3ResignedBishop of Veroli, Italy
6 May 170971.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
1 Mar 172284.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico de Zaoli (Zaulis):
Archbishop Domenico de Zaoli (Zaulis) (born 1638, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375, and Page 412
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 233, Number 1,447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015