Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Tupputi

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1665BornBarletta
25 Mar 170034.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172459.0AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
24 Sep 172459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
Jan 174074.3DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Tupputi:
Bishop NicolÚ Tupputi (born ) Bishop of Nusco

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 294
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013