Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Rossi (Rosso e Colonna), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1685BornNapoli
22 Dec 170823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Oct 172741.9AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
5 Oct 172741.9Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
26 Sep 173549.9AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
8 Jul 173751.7AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
6 Jul 174761.7DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Rossi (Rosso e Colonna):
Archbishop Domenico Rossi (Rosso e Colonna) O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1746
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013