Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clemens August Maria von Bayern

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Hildesheim

Bishop of Münster

Bishop of Osnabrück

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1700BornBrussels
26 Mar 171615.6SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
19 May 171615.7ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Mar 171918.6SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
27 Mar 171918.6SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
26 Apr 171918.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
30 Apr 171918.7ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
9 May 172221.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
22 Jun 172221.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Nov 172323.2SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
8 Feb 172423.4SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
3 Aug 172423.9ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 Mar 172524.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 172727.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Nov 172828.2SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
23 Dec 172828.3ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
6 Feb 176160.4DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Clemens August Maria von Bayern
Archbishop Clemens August Maria von Bayern (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 272, and Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Feb 2016