Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Herman Dosquet, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1691³BornLiège, Belgium
24 Sep 171827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
26 Nov 172736.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
26 Nov 172736.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
25 Dec 172736.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
19 Feb 172937.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
24 Jul 173039.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
12 Sep 173342.5SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
25 Jun 173948.3ResignedBishop of Québec, Canada
4 Mar 177786.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Herman Dosquet:
Bishop Pierre-Herman Dosquet P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Québec

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015