Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Maria Passati, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1620Born
13 May 168059.4AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
19 May 168059.4Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
8 Aug 168059.6DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Maria Passati
Bishop Giacinto Maria Passati O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola di Mezzo

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast