Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Fonseca

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1690³BornAvignon
29 Mar 172130.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 172434.1AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
7 Jan 172534.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
9 Dec 176373.0DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Fonseca:
Bishop Antonio Fonseca (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1725, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015