Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Dominic Williams, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornMonmouthshire
11 Dec 172564.9SelectedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 172564.9ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 172564.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
30 Dec 172564.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
3 Apr 174079.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Dominic Williams:
Bishop Thomas Dominic Williams O.P. (born 1661, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,867
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015