Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop VIncenzo Maria Mazzoleni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1667Born
6 Aug 169022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Nov 172760.2AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
7 Dec 172760.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
18 Jun 173163.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
16 Dec 174174.3DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

MicroData Summary for VIncenzo Maria Mazzoleni
Archbishop VIncenzo Maria Mazzoleni O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 172
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast